THE IOLANTHE MIDWIFERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement and promotion of training, education, professional development and research in the field of Midwifery and disseminating information about the research findings and other activities we fund
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 September 2020: CIO registration
- 11 January 2022: Funds received from 287283 THE IOLANTHE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Bannon | Chair | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Tumelty | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jenny McNeill | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emilola Ornato | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elf | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Gadhvana | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Logan Van Lessen | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Rhys Davies | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Thomas | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £67.62k | £56.67k | £72.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £57.34k | £83.03k | £74.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2020 as amended on 28 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE TRAINING EDUCATION PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF MIDWIFERY AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH DEVELOPMENT AND RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rebecca Dymond Office F1
Beverley Enterprise Centre
Beck View Road
Beverley
HU17 0JT
- Phone:
- 07901341993
- Email:
- info@iolanthe.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window