THE MELBOURNE GARDENS CHARITY CAPITAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and management of Melbourne Hall gardens
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD RALPH WILLIAM FRANCIS JOSEPH KERR | Trustee |
|
||||||
LADY MARIE CLAIRE KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAL GRAHAM GIEDROYC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.12k | £36.38k | £23.60k | £50.32k | £61.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.55k | £189.97k | £183.65k | £47.08k | £39.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 August 2023 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE TRUST FUND AND THE TRUST INCOME IN LAYING OUT PLANTING, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION AND UPKEEP OF THE TRUST LAND AS A GARDEN IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MELBOURNE HALL
CHURCH SQUARE
MELBOURNE
DERBY
DE73 8EN
- Phone:
- 01332862502
- Email:
- melbhall@globalnet.co.uk
- Website:
-
melbournehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window