ST AUSTELL REVIVAL TOGETHER (START)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Clothing Bank ,where people in clothing poverty can access preloved clothing giving them their dignity. The Swap Shop, where items can be swapped for items of similar value, both of these activities stop items going to land fill. Crafty Chat where people in social isolation can come together to learn new crafts and meet people, we aim to follow this up with up cycling clothing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,250 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 02 October 2020: CIO registration
- 05 September 2022: Funds received from 1174811 LITTLE WRENS WARDROBE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Devline Dalzell | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Foster | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sweeney | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.37k | £6.19k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £5.83k | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £1.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST PEOPLE IN ST AUSTELL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GOOD QUALITY DONATED CLOTHING, TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS FREE OF CHARGE TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ST AUSTELL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. 3) TO PROTECT AND SAFEGUARD THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF RE-USE OF PRODUCTS THROUGH THE OPERATION OF A ‘SWAP SHOP’ PROJECT OFFERING ACCESS TO USED HOUSEHOLD ITEMS THROUGH AN EXCHANGE AND BARTERING SYSTEM AS A MEANS OF PREVENTING AND MINIMISING WASTE DISPOSAL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Carvath House
Eastbourne Road
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4UB
- Phone:
- 07596483549
- Email:
- staustellrevival@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window