WINDRUSH LEGAL ANGELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of need amongst people who have been affected directly or indirectly by immigration law and policy in the United Kingdom, in particular by the impact of the Windrush scandal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 22 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY IMMIGRATION LAW AND POLICY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BY THE IMPACT OF THE WINDRUSH SCANDAL, BY: 3.1 PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING ACCESS TO LEGAL ADVICE, COUNSEL, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION INCLUDING IN ACCESSING THE WINDRUSH COMPENSATION SCHEME; 3.2 PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING ACCESS TO COUNSELLING, PEER SUPPORT AND OTHER ADVICE AND SERVICES; 3.3 RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS INCLUDING AMONG PUBLIC SERVANTS OF THE LAW IN RELATION TO IMMIGRATION AND NATIONALITY AND BY MEANS INCLUDING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, SEMINARS, WEBINARS, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE SAME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window