WEST END (BURNLEY) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate West End Community Centre & we took this over in October 2020 under an asset transfer from Lancashire County Council. We use the centre to run a wide variety of activities that benefit local children, young people & families, in addition to which we enable other VCFS organisations to deliver activities that meet local needs. We also run a charity shop that includes a food bank.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £70,200 from 7 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 May 2021: CIO registration
- WEST END (BURNLEY) COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Ann Fairclough | Chair | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Marie Harrison | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Robins | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Durkin | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Robins | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Foster | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Michael Keene | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Lynsey Turmore | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Reynolds | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mary Moolgoaker | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Bailey | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.92k | £188.02k | £157.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.41k | £179.42k | £192.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.55k | £81.06k | £70.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 May 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH WEST BURNLEY (KNOWN AS WEST END), AS BOUNDED TO THE NORTH BY THE M65 MOTORWAY AND THE RAILWAY LINE, WITH ROSSENDALE ROAD AND COAL CLOUGH LANE FORMING THE SOUTHWEST AND SOUTHEAST BOUNDARIES RESPECTIVELY (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SERVICES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS; 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL CARE AND FACILITIES; 3.1.3 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH, YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SOCIAL WELFARE SERVICES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FOOD BANKS AND ADVICE REGARDING WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West End Community Centre
Venice Street
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB11 4BA
- Phone:
- 01282435865
- Website:
-
westendburnley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window