Accounts and annual returns BRIGHT DESTINY

Charity number: 1193236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 August 2024 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 August 2024 183 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 April 2023 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 April 2023 80 days late Download Open in new window