LOBIKO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide services to the Congolese community in the UK and Congo. Our work focuses on public health, and socio-ecomical issues related to health. We work directly with the National AIDS programme in Congo (PNMLS) and other NGOs to support our goal in ending AIDS in the Congo. In regards to mental and psychological problems, we work with Doctors to ensure everyone is informed about their health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 August 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Horcelie Sinda Wa Mbongo | Chair | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Junior Bubintende Masandi | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Werth Nsombo | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/08/2021 | 02/08/2022 | 02/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £420 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £420 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 August 2023 | 09 June 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2023 | 09 June 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE BY PROVIDING INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON OVERCOMING ISSUES AFFECTING MENTAL HEALTH AND PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV AIDS. Ò RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES THAT AFFECTS MENTAL HEALTH Ò HELPING INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS INFORMATION FOR GENERAL MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING IN ALL STAGES OF LIFE, THROUGH HEALTH PROMOTION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY; AND Ò ORGANISING MENTAL HEALTH SEMINARS AND OUTREACH PROJECTS FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC Ò OFFERS PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS (SERVICE USERS) WITH HIGH QUALITY INFORMATION, ADVISE AND SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Priory House
Springfield Grove
LONDON
SE7 7TH
- Phone:
- 07954409561
- Email:
- Lobikoyacongo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window