Financial history FRIENDS OF STANLEY

Charity number: 516731
Charity reporting is up to date (298 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £6.95k £1.84k £0 £2.73k £13.33k
Total expenditure £5.74k £1.95k £1.07k £1.05k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A