ALDERLEY EDGE COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primary school PTA raising funds from activities to provide equipment and services that benefit the children within the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 12 September 1985: Standard registration
- ALDERLEY EDGE COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ALDERLEY EDGE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TZU-TUN LIU | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Walker | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gordon Duffus | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nina Simone Ahrens | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Hughes | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Cook | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.99k | £13.86k | £52.97k | £19.13k | £24.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.54k | £10.87k | £3.35k | £6.38k | £30.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/1997 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF,PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH LANE
ALDERLEY EDGE
CHESHIRE
SK9 7UZ
- Phone:
- 01625582213
- Email:
- pta@aecps.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window