THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE'S GROVE PARK LEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Augustine's is an Anglian parish church within the Diocese of Southwark, the main purpose of which is to serve the community as a place of worship and prayer, as a place of friendship and support and a place to celebrate special occassions. St Augustine's promotes the whole mission of the church, pastoral,social, evangelistic and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Lewisham
Governance
- 28 September 2020: Standard registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S CHURCH GROVE PARK PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gavin Anthony Berriman | Chair | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Orton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Walker | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Cartwright | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Brian John Stocks | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Florence | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Alan Burtt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Hawes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cartwright | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Nyazika | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Gregory Walker | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Burtt | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER TOWN | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.34k | £118.34k | £112.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.45k | £113.22k | £128.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. AUGUSTINES CHURCH
336 BARING ROAD
LONDON
SE12 0DX
- Phone:
- 02088574941
- Website:
-
staugustines~grovepark.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window