Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL FILM AND SCI-FI MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1192444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 04 March 2025 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 03 October 2024 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required