THE DOCTOR E WYNNE JONES MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL GRANTS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Conwy
Governance
- 13 January 1986: Standard registration
- 23 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £4 | £3 | £2 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £1.50k | £500 | £1.50k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 10 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 22 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 20 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 16 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JULY 1984,AS AMENDED ON 4 FEBRUARY 2002 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A GRANT/GRANTS ON AN ANNUAL BASIS TO A YOUNG PERSON/PERSONS SHOWING EXCEPTIONAL PROMISE IN HISE CHOSEN FIELD, AND WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE AND HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN PENMAENMAWR FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS, IN ORDER TO ASSIST HIS EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF PENMAENMAWR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window