THE MAYA ARIBURNU FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to benefit children in Kampala, Uganda, particularly those that are orphaned and/or vulnerable as these children are particularly at risk of poverty, ill health, malnourishment, lack of education, exploitation etc. and therefore most in need of help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maya Ariburnu | Chair | 22 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dalinc Ariburnu | Trustee | 22 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £99.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £88.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG ORPHAN, HOMELESS AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN KAMPALA, UGANDA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (I) OPERATING AN ORPHANAGE; AND (II) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHO ATTEND THE ORPHANAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 GILSTON ROAD
LONDON
SW10 9SR
- Phone:
- 02073703377
- Email:
- mariburnu@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window