HEALTH DATA RESEARCH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The national institute for health data for England, Wales, Scotland and N Ireland. We develop and apply cutting-edge data science approaches to clinical, biological, genomic and other multi-dimensional health data to address the most pressing health research challenges facing the public. Our mission is to unite, improve and use the UK's health data to enable discoveries that improve people's lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,241,477
Donations and legacies | £11.12m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.02k | |
Other | £95.03k |
Total expenditure:
£17,556,768
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £17.56m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,253,872 from 14 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £17.56m |
People

97 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 10 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 May 2021: Standard registration
- HDR UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Julie Moore | Chair | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Robina Shah | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anita Rose Charlesworth | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Haseeb Ahmad | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julia Alison Noble | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Prof. Sir Nilesh Jayantilal Samani | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir David Sloman | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Prabhu Arumugam | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Junaid Bajwa | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROF DAME JANET MAUREEN THORNTON | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patsy Wilkinson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Newland | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wilcox | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Elder | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Bithell | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Boa | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lord James Richard O'Shaughnessy | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.65m | £85.62m | £11.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.90m | £31.55m | £17.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £77.19m | £8.25m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £64.64m | £85.62m | £11.12m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £3.19k | £22.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £15.40k | £1.00k | £95.03k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £32.90m | £31.55m | £17.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £153.12k | £171.70k | £180.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £19.84m | £19.89m | £5.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £199.21k | £140.29k | £212.85k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £47.79m | £95.37m | £83.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £16.01m | £9.45m | £4.20m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 MAY 2021 as amended on 21 Mar 2024 as amended on 16 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
1.TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE USE OF HEALTH DATA SCIENCE BY: I.THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF BIOMEDICAL AND HEALTH DATA RESEARCH; II.THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TOOLS, TECHNOLOGIES, SKILLS AND PARTNERSHIPS REQUIRED TO TRANSFORM HEALTH INFORMATICS RESEARCH AND INNOVATION; III.THE SHARING OF INFORMATION, IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES TO ACHIEVE BETTER HEALTH OUTCOMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL AND HEALTH RESEARCH, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY UNDERTAKING, PROMOTING, DISSEMINATING AND IMPROVING RESEARCH INTO BIOMEDICAL AND HEALTH INFORMATICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Health Data Research UK
Gibbs Building
215 Euston Road
London
NW1 2BE
- Phone:
- 02039503715
- Email:
- enquiries@hdruk.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window