Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST REVELATION OF HOPE PARISH

Charity Number: 1192163
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 May 2025 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 May 2025 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 May 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 May 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 August 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 August 2022 34 days late Download Open in new window