CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST REVELATION OF HOPE PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith ( as written in the statement of beliefs) and in such parts of the UK as the trustees from time to time as the think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Festus Ipoola Okelola | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
OLUWATOYIN A KING-PAUL | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN IRETOOGOOLUWA ADEMILUYI | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.22k | £60.22k | £80.09k | £62.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.86k | £78.86k | £76.33k | £63.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 May 2025 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 May 2025 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST
LEEDS PLACE
LONDON
N4 3RF
- Phone:
- 07534519604
- Email:
- revelationparish@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window