THE EARTHSONG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation awards grants for purposes within its objects, with a primary focus on the areas of music education, herbal medicine and environmental regeneration in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Allison Pole | Chair | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thaddeus Jovian Mieczyslaw Korbusz | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Felix Cornwallis Pole | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosa Stephanie Viola Corbishley | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|||||
PHILIP EDWARD RABY | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £380.00k | £384.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £244.78k | £305.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT(S) OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO FACILITATE ACCESS TO, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE SUBJECT OF, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION), MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS; 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE SCIENCE, STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HERBAL MEDICINE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ONLINE RESOURCE TO (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) SHARE RESEARCH AND INFORMATION RELATING TO HERBAL MEDICINE; (B) BY ESTABLISHING BURSARIES IN MEDICAL HERBAL RESEARCH; 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND REGENERATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY): (A) THE PROMOTION OF BIODIVERSITY; (B) THE PREVENTION OR MITIGATION OF CLIMATE CHANGE; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF ORGANIC AND SUSTAINABLE FARMING TECHNIQUES; 3.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Richardson Swift
11 Laura Pl
Bathwick
Bath
BA2 4BL
- Phone:
- 01179252020
- Email:
- Info@earthsongfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window