EMPOWERING CHILDREN WITH EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ECE provides support to disadvantaged young people from poor backgrounds to access education through payments of school fees, purchase of school uniform, sanitary pads, books and food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thokozile Gondolosi | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Blessing Gondolosi | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Balbina Masambasi | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £670 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 06 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Annual return | 06 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1057 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ZIMBABWE BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR SCHOOL TUITION FEES AND SCHOOL RESOURCES THAT WILL ALLOW FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION (II) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG GIRLS, LIVING IN ZIMBABWE, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH SANITARY ITEMS AND RELATED PRODUCTS AS THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH ITEMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 PLYM CLOSE
AYLESBURY
HP21 8SX
- Phone:
- 07889668014
- Email:
- tgondolosi@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window