ECHOES CHARITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Echoes Charity CIO is in the process of setting up an online service that will provide free groups, workshops, an information hub and a creative corner, supporting adult mental health and disability. We will continuously listen to the public needs through surveys and will provide support for those needs in a timely manner. All provision is from qualified counsellors and psychotherapists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
- 12 May 2025: Funds received from 1070776 FAMILIES FIRST CHARITY LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rayna Shock | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Toni Jackson | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beaumont | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £358 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY EDUCATING AND COUNSELLING THROUGH WORKSHOPS, THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT AND TRAINING THOSE DISADVANTAGED BY CIRCUMSTANCES IN ENGLAND AND WALES TO IMPROVE THEIR WELLBEING, SKILLS, UNDERSTANDING AND COMPETENCIES AND TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WORTLEY CLOSE
CAWSTON
RUGBY
CV22 7GF
- Phone:
- 07783885354
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window