Accounts and annual returns WOODFIELD ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1192645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 December 2023 26 January 2025 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2023 26 January 2025 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 December 2022 05 December 2024 427 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2022 05 December 2024 427 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 December 2021 20 January 2023 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2021 04 April 2023 181 days late Download Open in new window