WOODFIELD ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a sanctuary for and care for animals who have been subject to mistreatment ,abandonment or cruelty and to raise funds for the support of such animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie katina Lloyd | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Stanley Roberts | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Wallis | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALYSON RUTH EDWARDS MS | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/12/2021 | 05/12/2022 | 05/12/2023 | 05/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.21k | £140.25k | £178.63k | £181.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.97k | £122.93k | £182.96k | £165.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 December 2023 | 26 January 2025 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2023 | 26 January 2025 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 December 2022 | 05 December 2024 | 427 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2022 | 05 December 2024 | 427 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2021 | 04 April 2023 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A RESCUE HOME, SANCTUARY OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODFIELD
WELSHMOOR
LLANRHIDIAN
SWANSEA
SA3 1EX
- Phone:
- 01792390455
- Email:
- woodfieldhouse@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window