UNITED AFRICAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include the provision of weekly African food parcels at Leicester Street Community Centre in Northampton. We operate an admin office at Barratt House, Kingsthorpe Road, Northampton, NN2 6EZ providing one to one support, outreach services in partnership with CAB. Other activities include African drumming, ladies swimming, IT sessions, online immigration sessions, health & wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 July 2024
Total income includes £26,185 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 December 2020: Standard registration
- UAA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Wankiiri | Chair | 04 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Richard Dobson | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muchineripi Rwizi | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pedro Duarte | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Kinuthia | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/07/2021 | 04/07/2022 | 04/07/2023 | 03/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.75k | £45.48k | £124.43k | £206.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.08k | £54.24k | £103.21k | £186.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.80k | £11.53k | £42.22k | £26.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOV 2020 as amended on 24 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NORTHAMPTON BY PROVIDING AFRICAN FOOD PARCELS, NON-FOOD ESSENTIALS SUCH AS PERSONAL AND HOUSEHOLD ESSENTIALS, CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS AS WELL AS SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER PARTNER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
United African Association
Unit F5B
Barratt House
Kingsthorpe Road
NORTHAMPTON
- Phone:
- 07932519532
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window