THE ROPEWALK (BARTON) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ropewalk (Barton) charity run The Ropewalk Arts Centre and Museum in Barton upon Humber.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £116,484 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 April 2021: Standard registration
- 15 September 2022: Funds received from 1120488 ST-ART
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN WALLIS | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Avison | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Paul Drant | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Millum | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Leaning | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA BISSETT | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
NEIL KING | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.00k | £257.09k | £315.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.00k | £281.05k | £329.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £152.80k | N/A | £116.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN, THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE, AND SCIENCE, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: A) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM RELATING TO INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE AND ITS AND PERMANENT COLLECTIONS, INCLUDING BY ACQUIRING SUITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE COLLECTIONS; B) PROMOTING AND EXHIBITING WORKS OF ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE AND PROVIDING GALLERY SPACE FOR THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF WORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ropewalk
Maltkiln Road
Barton Upon Humber
North Lincs
DN185JT
- Phone:
- 01652660380
- Email:
- liz@the-ropewalk.co.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.THE-ROPEWALK.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window