THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust in order of priority are: 1) To benefit old persons residing in the area of the former Urban District of Uxbridge; 2) To benefit such persons residing elsewhere in the London Borough of Hillingdon; 3) For any charitable purpose for the general benefit of the inhabitants of the said London Borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 23 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Bennett | Chair | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||
John Hensley | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||
Kamal Preet Kaur | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||
Dr Reva GUDI | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||
Connor Liberty | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||
James Attias | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||
Johanna Marren-King | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||
REETA CHAMDAL | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||
KELLY MARTIN | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLD PERSONS RESIDING IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF UXBRIDGE; (2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS RESIDING ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH HILLINGDON; (3) FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kate Fassnidge Community Hall
2 Harefield Road
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 1GW
- Phone:
- 01895371003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window