WHITSTABLE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Christian worship and teaching, providing spiritual and emotional direction and support. We also provide a place for community and social interaction, and offer pastoral and practical care to those in spiritual, emotional and physical need. We provide activities for children and young people, and seek to serve the needs of the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 17 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Grant | Chair | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Bain | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gingell | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justine Michelle Fitchett | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Milne | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.39k | £72.69k | £72.45k | £77.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.91k | £62.19k | £62.90k | £66.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN WHITSTABLE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING WORSHIP, PRAYER, COMMUNITY AND CHRISTIAN TEACHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
38A Pigeon Lane
HERNE BAY
Kent
CT6 7ES
- Phone:
- 07733 318167
- Website:
-
whitstablecommunity.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window