THE A J STONE AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1192096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education, the relief of poverty, the promotion of religious and such other public objects being charitable as the Trustees may decide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £18,567
Total expenditure: £102,309

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW STONE Chair 06 December 2019
M J C STONE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE COUNTRY FOOD TRUST
Received: On time
Dominic Stone Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Frederick Stone Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Marina Stone Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £11.79k £18.82k £18.57k
Total expenditure £12.34k £39.50k £102.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 May 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 ST. ALBANS GROVE
LONDON
W8 5PN
Phone:
02070966356
Website:

No information available