JACOBS WELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and operate the Jacobs Well village hall, Jacobs Well Road, Guildford, for the benefit of local reidents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David George Capon | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Laurence Clark | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFERY MICHAEL DUBERY | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £67.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £56.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF JACOBS WELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR TO BE USED FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jacobs Well Village Hall
Jacobs Well Road
Jacob's Well
GUILDFORD
GU4 7PD
- Phone:
- 07482 632 144
- Email:
- chair@jwvht.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window