CHURCH STRETTON GOOD NEIGHBOURS CARE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of transport to largely elderly people for medical appointments. Also provision of daily, weekly and monthly lunches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
126 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 05 October 2020: CIO registration
- 12 January 2022: Funds received from 516348 CHURCH STRETTON GOOD NEIGHBOURS CARE GROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mannering Middleton | Chair | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Hall | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Hall | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Andrew MA,BMus | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elizabeth Brown | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Ann Cooper | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Cornwell | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.96k | £11.06k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £906 | £2.24k | £15.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, POVERTY OR ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF A NON-PROFIT MAKING COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH STRETTON MEDICAL PRACTICE
EASTHOPE ROAD
CHURCH STRETTON
SY6 6BL
- Phone:
- 01694724242
- Email:
- csgoodneighbours@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window