TOWN HALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Town Hall Foundation is the charitable arm of Town Hall Dental, focused on the mission of providing oral healthcare treatments and oral health education for those who need it the most. The oral healthcare Town Hall Foundation provides is predominantly focused on the homeless, ex-homeless and isolated, and otherwise vulnerable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- France
Governance
- 11 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Jane Twemlow-Kay | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Topley | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kam Chana | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Imran Rangzeb | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.99k | £30.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.22k | £26.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TOWN HALL FOUNDATION WILL PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED IN TERMS OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AND POVERTY BY PROVIDING DENTAL CARE AND ORAL HEALTH EDUCATION TO IMPROVE WELLBEING AND OVERALL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD TOWN HALL
THORNTON SQUARE
BRIGHOUSE
HD6 1EA
- Phone:
- 01484723788
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window