THE GENTLE APPROACH TO CANCER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVICE AND TREATMENT TO CANCER PATIENTS AND THEIR HELPERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 September 1985: Standard registration
- CANCER VIVE (Working name)
- MORECAMBE BAY CANCER HELP CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH HOPKINSON | Chair | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anne Stewart | Trustee | 12 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MORLEY | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VICTORIA BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE GAYWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ELIZABETH RACHEL ALBERTA NEWSON BM BCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.53k | £599 | £707 | £824 | £3.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £565 | £4.43k | £4.27k | £6.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MAY 1985, AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 MAY 1992.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE FORMS OF THERAPY SUITABLE TO THE INDIVIDUAL NEEDS OF THE PERSONS CONCERNED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 HAYMARKET
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
FY8 3LW
- Phone:
- 01253 640247
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window