UNCLE PAUL'S CHILLI FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an alternative environment where people with SEND or social disadvantage can learn new skills knowledge, and experience for sustainable employment and independent living. We offer a large range of activities at the farm, kitchen, cafe and collaborate with education partners and community organisations to ensure the successful progress of our beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Fey | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Amanda Solomon | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lewis | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Ford | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PHILLIPS | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.19k | £191.00k | £195.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.67k | £90.58k | £167.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OR OTHER SIMILAR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE AS INDEPENDENTLY AS POSSIBLE BY PROVIDING RESOURCES, TRAINING, MENTORING, WORKING EXPERIENCE AND EMPLOYMENT SUPPORT. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY FACILITATING ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES WHICH WILL DEVELOP THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES AND COMPETENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUTCOMBE FARM
BUTCOMBE
BRISTOL
BS40 7UW
- Phone:
- 07795414143
- Email:
- info@chillicharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window