MAKE A MEDIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make a Medic is a UK-based charity that aims to support the medical education of medical students in developing countries. We raise funds through ticket sales & sponsorship for academic events; social events; and online medical resources. Our projects range from filling libraries, funding training programmes and sponsoring stethoscopes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Kenya
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 16 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lasith Ranasinghe | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syra Dhillon | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | £14.59k | £9.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.87k | £12.52k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STUDENTS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL, TRAINING AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 ADMIRALS WAY
HETHERSETT
NORWICH
NR9 3AQ
- Phone:
- 07500116870
- Email:
- chair@makeamedic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window