CATALYST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children living in the world's most dangerous and poor places are at risk of poverty, exploitation and abuse. In places where conflict, famine and political instability are persistent, children are inevitably at a greater risk. The trustees will be giving children and their communities life-changing basics like nutritious food, clean water, healthcare and education. In places of extreme povert
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Botswana
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Mapondera | Chair | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Fox | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MANDHLA SAMUEL DHLODHLO | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Tamsen Jayne Garrie | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.50k | £195.42k | £202.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.49k | £157.32k | £230.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTHERN AFRICA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL FEES; SCHOOL UNIFORMS AND EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT; FOOD HAMPERS; HEALTH CHECKS AND ANY OTHER SUCH SERVICES THAT THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2510 The Quadrant
Aztec West
Almondsbury
BRISTOL
BS32 4AQ
- Phone:
- 07825679630
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window