PUBLIC STATUES AND SCULPTURE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Champions interest in sculpture in public spaces in the UK; Preserves, protects, records and publishes our shared sculptural heritage; Encourages public appreciation and engagement with public sculpture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 September 2020: CIO registration
- PSSA (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Ruth Barnes | Chair | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kader | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kira d'Alburquerque | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sokari Douglas Camp CBE | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Keith Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wenley | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Roger Bowdler | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Leonie Summers | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Stocker | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Holly Trusted | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.41k | £17.34k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.82k | £21.02k | £9.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 November 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 November 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF SCULPTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- - INCREASING AWARENESS OF THE UK’S PUBLIC SCULPTURE FROM THE MEDIAEVAL TO THE CONTEMPORARY AND TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND RECORD OUR SHARED SCULPTURAL HERITAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; - PROMOTING AND IMPROVING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND POSITIVE INTERACTION WITH PUBLIC STATUES AND SCULPTURE THROUGH EDUCATION AND PUBLICATIONS; - PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY OF DESIGN AND APPROPRIATE MAINTENANCE PROGRAMMES FOR NEW SCULPTURAL WORKS IN THE COMMON DOMAIN FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CASSIOBURY PARK AVENUE
WATFORD
WD18 7LA
- Phone:
- 07860868490
- Email:
- jomaalha@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
pssauk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window