THE OLIVE BRANCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a bridge into the community and an oasis for people to enjoy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 09 September 1985: Standard registration
- 24 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1132188 RHIWBINA BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.00k | £127.40k | £106.64k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.66k | £110.50k | £101.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 May 2023 | 375 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1985 AS AMENDED 11TH MAY 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ENCOURAGING CHRISTIANS TO STUDY THE WORD OF GOD. TO APPLY BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES TO EVERY ASPECT OF LIFE BY THE PROPOGATION OF CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE AND TRUTHS BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY WORK AND TRUTHS BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY WORK AND RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window