PATH (YORKSHIRE) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PATH provides Positive Action Training to Black and Minority Ethnic people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £324,355 from 7 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melvyn Wyatt | Chair | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Landrith Isaac PHD | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Bailey | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £579.74k | £383.49k | £358.92k | £491.07k | £423.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £602.93k | £373.44k | £361.32k | £448.97k | £420.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.98k | £179.54k | £402.97k | £324.36k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £26.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £550.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £602.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 MARCH 1992, 17 APRIL 2002 AND 5 JULY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING, SKILLS AND EMPLOYMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED, OR MAY SUFFER, DISADVANTAGE BY REASON OF THEIR COLOUR, RACE OR NATIONALITY OR BY REASON OF ANY OF THE CHARACTERISTICS AS DEFINED BY THE EQUALITY ACT 2010, OR WHERE THEIR SOCIO-ECONOMIC STATUS MAY HINDER EDUCATIONAL, LEARNING OR EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 HARROGATE ROAD
CHAPEL ALLERTON
LEEDS
LS7 3PD
- Phone:
- 01132624600
- Email:
- INFO@PATHYORKSHIRE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window