OPEN HOUSE ROCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of those who are homeless or at risk of homelessness, in need of a meal and refreshment on a frequent or occasional basis in the Medway area, who choose to attend each Saturday at the Quaker Meeting House in Rochester. We provide food, drinks and an opportunity for social interaction and information in a peaceful, caring and non-judgemental environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Medway
Governance
- 14 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Merrill Doris Eleda Woolf | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nanda Joree | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Daly BDS NUI | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JILL IRENE RUSSELL | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Captain Stephen Ramshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81k | £3.69k | £5.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.23k | £6.26k | £5.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, IN NEED OF A MEAL AND REFRESHMENTS, ON A FREQUENT OR OCCASIONAL BASIS, IN THE MEDWAY AREA WHO CHOOSE TO ATTEND EACH SATURDAY AT THE QUAKER MEETING HOUSE IN ROCHESTER BY PROVIDING FOOD, DRINKS AND AN OPPORTUNITY FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND INFORMATION IN A PEACEFUL, CARING AND NON-JUDGMENTAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 NEVILLE CLOSE
PENENDEN HEATH
MAIDSTONE
ME14 2DS
- Phone:
- 01622679948
- Email:
- ohprochester@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window