TAVISTOCK AND PORTMAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds for the prevention, relief, treatment and cure of sickness, ill health and infirmity of every kind in the field of mental health and the promotion of wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Edward Harcourt | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Mark Charles Freestone | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel James | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eenasul Fateh | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Louise Lyon | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Greatley | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Elizabeth Rustin | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig de Sousa | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £96.29k | £55.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £82.21k | £180.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 March 2023 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 March 2023 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PREVENTION, RELIEF, TREATMENT AND CURE OF SICKNESS, ILL HEALTH AND INFIRMITY OF EVERY KIND IN THE FIELD OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE PROMOTION OF WELLBEING AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE FURTHERANCE OR SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE TAVISTOCK AND PORTMAN NHS FOUNDATION TRUST IN ANY WAYS WHICH SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING BE CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tavistock and Portman Charity
The Tavistock Centre
120 Belsize Lane
London
NW3 5BA
- Phone:
- 02074357111
- Email:
- CHARITY@TAVI-PORT.ORG
- Website:
-
tavistockandportmancharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window