SHROPSHIRE EPILEPSY SUPPORT

Charity Number: 1191527
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We run monthly Family epilepsy support meetings in the local area, which are designed to provide fun respite care to children who are affected by epilepsy, as well as support meetings for adults who are similarly affected. Our charity educates adults via our professional Epilepsy Awareness Training Programme, which aims to raise awareness of how epilepsy affects people socially and at work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 May 2023

Total income: £14,657
Total expenditure: £4,097

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Anthony Cooke Chair 14 March 2024
None on record
Sian Bebb Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Carla Angelika Barre Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023
Total gross income £2.67k £11.22k £14.66k
Total expenditure £2.09k £5.18k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 01 May 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 HOTSPUR STREET
SHREWSBURY
SY1 2QB
Phone:
07879190742