THE PETER HARRINGTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Peter Harrington Foundation makes grants and donations focused on advancing the education of new entrants into the rare book trade, charitable causes close to the rare book trade and giving grants to charities that provide emergency or essential relief and support to vulnerable individuals and families. We operate in the UK, primarily in London, but also support national and international aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Lawrence Harrington | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn O'Domhnaill | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Edward Sandall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.90k | £32.30k | £42.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.09k | £61.50k | £12.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
I. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS WORKING OR ASPIRING TO WORK WITHIN THE RARE BOOK TRADE IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TOWARDS TRAINING COURSES AND PROGRAMMES AND BY FUNDING OR OTHERWISE PROVIDING WORK PLACEMENTS AND OTHER FORMAL OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING RELATED DIRECTLY TO A CAREER OR PROSPECTIVE CAREER WITHIN THE RARE BOOK TRADE; II. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE SUBJECT TO POVERTY BY WAY OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY GRANTING DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE RELIEF ORGANISATIONS WHOSE WORK IS DIRECTLY AIMED AT RELIEVING THOSE PEOPLE IN NEED. III. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY GRANTING DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE RELIEF ORGANISATIONS WHOSE WORK IS DIRECTLY AIMED AT RELIEVING THOSE PEOPLE IN NEED. IV. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PROVIDING GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PETER HARRINGTON LTD
100 FULHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW3 6HS
- Phone:
- 02075910220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window