NATURE'S SAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cryopreservation and future reproductive technologies for endangered animal species
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Elizabeth Haines | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Young Windsor | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terri Elizabeth Hill | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stevie Sheppard | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony David Noble | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANNE EDWARDS | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
TULLIS ROBERT VYVYAN MATSON | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Angela Ashmore | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW TIMOTHY PETTIT | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.98k | £65.02k | £125.63k | £72.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.78k | £50.12k | £100.87k | £80.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JUN 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09 DEC 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
1.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY THROUGH THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1.1.1 EFFECTIVELY CRYOPRESERVING AND FACILITATING THE LONG-TERM STORAGE OF TISSUES CONTAINING IMMATURE GAMETES, GAMETES (REPRODUCTIVE CELLS), EMBRYOS AND CELL LINES FROM ANIMALS THAT ARE THREATENED WITH EXTINCTION THAT ARE HOUSED IN ZOOS, WILDLIFE PARKS AND AQUARIA IN A MANNER TO ENABLE LIVE CELL REGENERATION FOR FUTURE USE IN ASSISTED REPRODUCTIVE TECHNOLOGY; 1.1.2 WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH ORGANISATIONS, WHICH HAVE SIMILAR MISSIONS, AND PROVIDING A VIABLE SOURCE OF CRYOPRESERVED MATERIAL TO CONTRIBUTE TO POPULATION SUSTAINABILITY; 1.1.3 RESEARCHING GAMETE DEVELOPMENT OF ENDANGERED SPECIES TO SUPPORT FUTURE ASSISTED REPRODUCTIVE TECHNOLOGIES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS; 1.1.4 RESEARCHING AND DEVELOPING CRYO-PRESERVATION, VITRIFICATION, THAWING AND REGENERATION TECHNIQUES FOR GAMETES AND CELL LINES FROM MULTIPLE ENDANGERED TAXA AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS; 1.1.5 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE CELL CULTURE TECHNIQUES FOR A RANGE OF ENDANGERED TAXA; AND 1.1.6 DEVELOPING CAPACITY AND COMPETENCE TO CONTINUE TO ADVANCE SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE OF WILDLIFE CRYO-PRESERVATION AND REGENERATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nature's SAFE
Chapel Field Stud
Ash Lane
WHITCHURCH
SY13 4BP
- Phone:
- +447743780217
- Email:
- office@natures-safe.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window