MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide signposting to mental health services for sales people with poor mental health. Provide training to sales organisations on how to care for and monitor their staff's mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 November 2020: CIO registration
- MHA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Swallow | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian McMahon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM AITCHISON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.59k | £22.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.54k | £21.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 May 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 May 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF IT, SALES AND COMMUNICATION WORKERS EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF POOR MENTAL HEALTH IN THE WORKPLACE THROUGH: A) PROVIDING TELEPHONE AND ONE TO ONE PEER SUPPORT; B) SIGNPOSTING INDIVIDUALS TO ORGANISATIONS WHO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND ADVICE; C) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND PRESENTATIONS IN ORDER TO RAISE AWARENESS AND PROVIDE SUPPORT TO EMPLOYEES WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS AND PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING IMPROVEMENTS TO MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT IN THE WORKPLACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 TANSY AVENUE
STOTFOLD
HITCHIN
SG5 4GJ
- Phone:
- 03301244338
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window