UK FRIENDS OF TAGLIT

Charity Number: 1192283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN SUCH A WAY AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. The Charity operates in Israel and provides finance to implement educational visits to Israel by young adults living in England, in particular, but not exclusively, those between the ages of 18 and 32.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £125
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BIRTHRIGHT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GORDON HAUSMANN Chair 11 November 2020
THE HAUSMANN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE ASSAF HAROFEH MEDICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF EZRA LAMARPEH
Received: On time
UK FRIENDS OF I.D.C.
Received: On time
UK FRIENDS OF JRV
Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE OPEN UNIVERSITY OF ISRAEL (BFOUI)
Received: On time
UK FRIENDS OF THE ARTHUR RUBINSTEIN INTERNATIONAL MUSIC ASSOCIATION
Received: 63 days late
David Clive Emanuel Barnett Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Nathalie Pannick Lady Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Alexander Trager- Lewis Trustee 11 November 2020
BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE OPEN UNIVERSITY OF ISRAEL (BFOUI)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £125
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O C H HAUSMANN & CO
5 DE WALDEN COURT
85 NEW CAVENDISH STREET
LONDON
W1W 6XD
Phone:
02074366333
Website:

No information available