FRONTLINE LIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frontline Live has created a digital platform (see Frontline.live) to match the PPE needs of frontline healthcare workers with suppliers of PPE during the COVID-19 pandemic in the UK. Frontline Live is exploring with partners how this model, platform and playbook can be deployed for other emergencies, especially ones that require urgent needs matched by crowdsourced humanitarian supply.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katz Kiely | Chair | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Wheelhouse | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Joseph Nicholl | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mwangala Lishomwa | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Swan | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Alice Inman | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £24.95k | £27.67k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £18.59k | £3.30k | £36.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 February 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF NEED BY SUPPORTING HEALTHCARE AND FRONTLINE WORKERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY TO MATCH NEED AND SUPPLY FOR PERSONAL PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT AND TO COLLECT AND ANALYSE INFORMATION TO PROMOTE PERSONAL SAFETY (THE ÔOBJECTSÖ). IN THESE OBJECTS, THE EXPRESSION ÔHEALTHCARE AND FRONTLINE WORKERSÖ SHALL MEAN ANYONE WHO WORKS OR VOLUNTEERS TO DELIVER CARE AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT HEALTH, SAVE LIVES OR RELIEVE NEED. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemp House
160 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 08001114336
- Email:
- HELLO@FRONTLINE.LIVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window