Accounts and annual returns DIVINE JUSTICE CHURCH

Charity number: 1193839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2022 26 February 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 26 February 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 22 February 2024 480 days late Download Open in new window