Trustees UNITED WOMEN AFFILIATION
Charity Number: 1192288

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hawa Eve Yatera | Chair | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kija Shana | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yukabeth Otieno | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Nutter | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leodgar Mboya | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mutale Chileshe | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Amuli | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Niyonkuru | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kibena Misango | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.