CURIG CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire of building/Facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 16 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Gwalchmai | Chair | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Kathy Taylor | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip Taylor | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael David Dean | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||
JACQUELINE PUGH | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £107 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2022 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 June 2022 | 584 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT DATED 18 AUGUST 1985.
Charitable objects
TRUST PROPERY TO BE USED IN PERPETUITY BY THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE PARISH OF LLANGURIG IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS AS AN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF ANY RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH CHURCH IN THE PARISH OF LLANGURIG AFORESAID OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN WALES RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LLANGURIG AFORESAID AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LLANGURIG IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Wesley Place
LLANDINAM
Powys
SY17 5DW
- Phone:
- 01686 689142
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window