WHALE WISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whale Wise advances marine mammal conservation by: a) studying the interaction between marine mammal populations and human activity through scientific research; b) engaging the public with our work and marine conservation generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Iceland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michelle Elizabeth Fournet | Chair | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Douglas | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
EVA KARADOTTIR | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
EVA PRENDERGAST | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £27.23k | £33.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.93k | £13.20k | £15.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF MARINE MAMMALS, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) CONDUCTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH OF THE INTERACTIONS BETWEEN MARINE MAMMALS AND HUMAN ACTIVITY; AND (B) ENGAGING WITH THE PUBLIC THROUGH SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HAYES
HORTON
SWANSEA
SA3 1LB
- Phone:
- 00447990067776
- Email:
- info@whalewise.org
- Website:
-
whalewise.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window