Accounts and annual returns HOPELINK GLOBAL

Charity number: 1192127
Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Annual return 20 September 2022 27 October 2023 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2022 08 December 2023 141 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 September 2021 01 February 2023 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days