AVON VALLEY SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members enjoy learning and sharing skills, trying out new crafts, making new friends, and working on their own and community projects. Or they can just pop in for a cup of tea and a chat. All within the supportive atmosphere of a friendly group of like-minded people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Knight | Chair | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Curtis | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rex Dudley | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hooper | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Malcolm Dennis | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Nicola Kalsi | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Connolly | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £2.65k | £4.57k | £10.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33 | £1.27k | £4.10k | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE {PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER/OLDER MEN/OLDER MEN AND WOMEN}, WITHIN FORDINGBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA , FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRACRE
HYDE
FORDINGBRIDGE
SP6 2QH
- Phone:
- 07428590090
- Email:
- Avonvalleyshed@gmail.com
- Website:
-
AvonValleyShed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window